Accounts and annual returns THE FATHER'S HOUSE TRUST

Charity Number: 1124005
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 09 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 28 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 05 November 2013 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 22 October 2013 On Time