THE FATHER'S HOUSE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion, and in particular the message of the Father Heart of God and His Love, throughout the world for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures and conferences, producing and/or distributing literature on Christianity to enlighten others about the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
- United States
Governance
- 09 May 2008: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.89k | £113.79k | £10.48k | £12.92k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.00k | £126.07k | £37.89k | £32.46k | £25.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 12 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 09 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 28 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 05 November 2013 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 22 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 17 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE MESSAGE OF THE FATHER HEART OF GOD AND HIS LOVE, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CONFERENCES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window