Accounts and annual returns OLD YARDLEY HISTORIC BUILDING TRUST

Charity Number: 1123997
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 29 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 19 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required