Financial history LAZONBY AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1123849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £61.12k £67.05k £79.92k £101.70k £94.87k
Total expenditure £24.35k £54.40k £91.76k £98.96k £95.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.56k £23.25k £2.56k £1.51k £4.01k