Financial history CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERING SURVEYORS

Charity number: 1131469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £1.00m £1.10m £1.07m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.03m £867.95k £906.86k £1.06m £1.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £999.62k £1.04m £1.02m £1.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.03k £1.36k £1.63k £45.99k £20.64k
Income - Other £67.72k £3.72k £58.74k £0 £30.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £867.95k £906.86k £1.06m £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £51.34k £0 £0 £0 £37.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0