HAVEN TRUST SUPPORTING PEOPLE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Haven Trust Supporting People Limited provides 24 hour residential support to 9 persons who are recovering from substance misuse through an abstinence model.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
- 22 December 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1151797 THE HILL CHURCH SWANSEA
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.29k | £360.64k | £353.01k | £301.82k | £189.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.88k | £319.08k | £313.59k | £307.71k | £261.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £166.97k | £179.02k | £173.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £159.59k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
31 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS AND HAVE SUBSTANCE MISUSE PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION, SERVICES AND ADVICE SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SWANSEA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window