MASOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Masoom endeavours to provide humanitarian development, education and skill projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Waltham Forest
- Pakistan
Governance
- 14 July 2008: Standard registration
- MASOOM SUPPORT INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Talha Shaikh | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Harris Mahmood | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
MAHMOOD-UL HASSAN | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Sarah Shaikh | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88k | £917 | £927 | £958 | £913 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £339 | £237 | £245 | £276 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2025 | 449 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2014
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE, INCLUDING THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE. 2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN PAKISTAN AND TURKEY, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN AND TURKEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Churchill
London
E17 3AB
- Phone:
- 0300 111 3001
- Email:
- info@masoom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window