Financial history KEY CHANGES MUSIC THERAPY

Charity Number: 1124102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £146.26k £152.27k £186.31k £220.81k £244.19k
Total expenditure £122.68k £150.99k £183.15k £203.64k £253.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £4.36k £5.35k N/A