Financial history THE BEN HERRING TRUST

Charity Number: 1124662
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2010 01/07/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £16.57k £36.35k £5.60k £6.79k £13.73k
Total expenditure £2.34k £39.87k £2.75k £830 £21.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A