THE BEN HERRING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support research into Brain Tumours and to give help to children and young adults suffering from cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2008: Standard registration
- 27 June 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2010 | 01/07/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.57k | £36.35k | £5.60k | £6.79k | £13.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £39.87k | £2.75k | £830 | £21.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 April 2015 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 27 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SUFFERING FROM BRAIN TUMOURS BY FUNDING RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SUFFERING FROM CANCER.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window