SUE YOUNG CANCER SUPPORT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND

Charity number: 1124057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sue Young Cancer Support in Leicestershire and Rutland provides practical and emotional support to anyone affected by a cancer diagnosis in Leicester, Leicestershire and Rutland. Our services are available to cancer patients, their families and carers. Our support can last for many weeks, months or even years - as long as it is needed by the individual.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £126,896
Total expenditure: £217,797

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2008: Standard registration
  • 03 August 2021: Funds received from 1169791 SUPPORTING CONFIDENCE THROUGH EXERCISE
  • 11 July 2022: Funds received from 1156733 "20-20 VOICE" CANCER
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SUE YOUNG CANCER SUPPORT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND (Working name)
  • COPING WITH CANCER IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Courtney Nangle Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
Amarjit Singh Bhaur Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
William Richmond Trustee 30 July 2020
ZOUCH AND BEAUMONT STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
STOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £149.99k £211.76k £206.42k £166.19k £126.90k
Total expenditure £214.06k £157.87k £247.99k £263.69k £217.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £56.62k £113.68k £74.03k £67.94k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SUE YOUNG CANCER SUPPORT
HELEN WEBB HOUSE
35 WESTLEIGH ROAD
LEICESTER
LE3 0HH
Phone:
01162230055