Financial history SANTI VANARAM BUDDHIST ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1125174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £28.63k £15.05k £22.12k £46.62k £82.83k
Total expenditure £22.09k £15.85k £24.73k £40.39k £53.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A