Financial history YORKSHIRE YOGA

Charity number: 1124347
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.85k £96.81k £40.69k £29.91k £20.60k
Total expenditure £114.10k £68.84k £77.11k £26.39k £25.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.59k £19.93k £8.00k N/A £2.81k