YORKSHIRE YOGA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yoga, Yoga Therapy, Sport and Related Therapeutic Activities; Promotion of Good Health and Wellbeing; Treatment of Adults and Children with Physical and/or Mental Disabilities; Facility Hire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,805 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 June 2008: Standard registration
- 02 April 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 02 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1197495 INSPIRE YOUTH YORKSHIRE
- Balance Wellness Centre (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.85k | £96.81k | £40.69k | £29.91k | £20.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.10k | £68.84k | £77.11k | £26.39k | £25.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.59k | £19.93k | £8.00k | N/A | £2.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL, MENTAL, AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE COMMUNITY. TO IMPROVE WELLBEING; THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES RELATING TO YOGA, SPORT AND OTHER WELLBEING ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO SUPPORT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING. TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION FROM INDIVIDUALS FROM ACROSS THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, REGARDLESS OF A PARTICIPANT’S AGE, ABILITY OR DISABILITY, ETHNICITY, RELIGION AND SOCIO-ECONOMIC GROUP. TO WORK IN COLLABORATION WITH OTHER VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE INDIVIDUAL AND/OR COMMUNITY WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window