Financial history DENNIS O'NEILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.13k £10.00k £5.00k £5.00k £0
Total expenditure £15.10k £22.41k £18.25k £2.55k £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A