YOUTH BUSINESS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Business International is a not-for-profit organisation that leads a global network of independent country initiatives helping young people to start their own business and create employment. Through our network we assist young entrepreneurs, unable to find support elsewhere, with a combination of access to capital, mentoring, and other business development enabling sustainable job creation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,584,000
Donations and legacies | £96.00k | |
Charitable activities | £4.47m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £20.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,822,000
Raising funds | £286.00k | |
Charitable activities | £4.54m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £286.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.54m |
People

28 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Armenia
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Burundi
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- Dominica
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Poland
- Russia
- Serbia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Tanzania
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
Governance
- 01 May 2008: Standard registration
- THE PRINCE'S YOUTH BUSINESS INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- THE PRINCE OF WALES YOUTH BUSINESS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marta Ewa Krupinska | Chair | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Downey | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellora-Julie Parekh | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Maud Jessica Savill | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Babajide Oluwase | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Purity Gakuo | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Wallace | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meaghan Ramsey | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Adenike Adeyemi | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Smart | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Romeo Effs | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Tiessen | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21m | £6.61m | £2.78m | £6.12m | £4.58m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55m | £6.20m | £4.05m | £4.99m | £4.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £451.06k | £514.39k | £437.00k | £249.00k | £96.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.73m | £6.09m | £2.35m | £5.86m | £4.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.11k | £5.30k | £1.00k | £8.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.27m | £6.03m | £3.85m | £4.82m | £4.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £277.60k | £173.19k | £195.00k | £164.00k | £286.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £17.40k | £14.00k | £14.00k | £19.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £3.33m | £1.78m | £2.89m | £2.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.29k | £6.69k | £6.00k | £16.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.45m | £4.00m | £3.52m | £3.57m | £3.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £259.20k | £390.47k | £1.17m | £100.00k | £121.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/03/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/11/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 18-35 BY PROVIDING MENTORING, ADVICE AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE THROUGH THE YOUTH BUSINESS PROGRAMMES ("YBPS”) AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION THROUGH MENTORING, TRAINING, ADVOCACY AND THE EFFICIENT SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE THROUGH THE NETWORK OF YBPS; AND (C) RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT. 2)TO ENCOURAGE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND TO PROMOTE IT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES: AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landmark Office Space - Farringdon
1 Giltspur St
London
EC1A 9DD
- Phone:
- 02033262060
- Email:
- info@youthbusiness.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window