Financial history MAGAR ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1126656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.10k £43.71k £26.99k £66.36k £79.47k
Total expenditure £51.83k £38.02k £10.26k £33.74k £34.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A