JAFRI GLOBAL COMMUNITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free Study support for all children under the age of 14 yrs old in Leicestershire. Free sport session Counselling to needy people and guidance for economical upliftment and awareness of general education. Multifaiith events for peace and harmony Spiritual guidance Surveys started in different cities of India to help needy people educate and support themselves for the betterment of their lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 14 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kulsum Rajani | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHEHNAZ ZULFIKAR KARMALI RAJANI | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHABBIRALI VAKIL | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £15.29k | £19.48k | £11.38k | £5.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.16k | £19.77k | £9.63k | £20.90k | £5.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND ABROAD BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY, SECONDARY AND HIGHER EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES, TUITION CLASSES AND SCHOLARSHIPS. TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND ABROAD, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE, MARRIAGE SERVICES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR SERVICES FOR TREATMENT, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SPIRITUAL HEALING; TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG WIDOWS AND ORPHANS, THE POOR AND NEEDY BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES; TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGH FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND FAITH GROUPS, IN WAYS THAT CREATES TRUST, UNITY AND PEACE BETWEEN THEM TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Rockery Close
LEICESTER
LE5 4DQ
- Phone:
- 07590909905
- Email:
- jafritrustuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
jafriworldnews.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window