Accounts and annual returns BERRY BROW PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1124275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 March 2024 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 May 2022 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 May 2022 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window