Trustees BERRY BROW PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1124275

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SADIE JAYNE HAYES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Mallinson | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Louise Dean | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheryl England | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iram Rashid | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Jamie Strickson | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Farrell-Greenhaugh | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Pilling | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.