SPRINGS OF LIFE AND HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants to organisations working in Israel and the territories for the relief f financial hardship, providing accommodation and vocational training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 29 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Aileen Mercer | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Lewis Sharman | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Percival | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOHNSTON | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER DAVID JAMES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.64k | £72.15k | £129.56k | £110.69k | £105.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.69k | £70.28k | £130.84k | £109.11k | £107.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 24 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING ACCOMMODATION AND FUNDING FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SUCH PARTS OF ISRAEL OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
GLOBAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TABOR
LLITHFAEN
PWLLHELI
LL53 6NL
- Phone:
- 01758750202
- Email:
- peter@llithfaen.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window