CALVARY ASSEMBLY INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE REGULAR HOLDING OF EVENTS TO RAISE AN AWARENESS IN THE COMMUNITY ON THE BENEFITS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Ghana
- India
- Malawi
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 09 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEBORAH ADEKOYA | Chair |
|
||||||
ESTHER IKOTUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.25k | £59.89k | £57.77k | £55.91k | £59.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.08k | £52.15k | £54.70k | £63.40k | £62.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 401 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 401 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 2 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ( IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT 5 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE ORGANISATION IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 5
GLOBE INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
CEMENT BLOCK COTTAGES
GRAYS
ESSEX
- Phone:
- 07960127272
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window