Accounts and annual returns THE KESSLER COLLECTION

Charity number: 1125406
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 18 September 2012 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2010 27 September 2011 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 21 July 2011 On Time