UK CHILDREN'S NEUROLOGICAL RESEARCH CAMPAIGN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the raising of funds to develop integrated reseach and gathering of information in the field of Child Neurology. From November 2013 UKCNRC uses the campaign name "Child Brain Research"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 February 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2008: Standard registration
- 17 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1159115 BRITISH PAEDIATRIC NEUROLOGY ASSOCIATION
- CHILD BRAIN RESEARCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 24/02/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.49k | £55.03k | £40.43k | £64.33k | £30.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.32k | £50.64k | £50.24k | £50.30k | £52.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 February 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 February 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 21 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND ADVANCING NATIONAL COLLABORATIVE MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO CHILDHOOD NEUROLOGICAL AND NEUROMUSCULAR DISEASE AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window