Financial history THE FASD TRUST

Charity number: 1125212
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2014 27/02/2015 27/02/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £30.35k £42.24k £49.46k £68.61k £9.55k
Total expenditure £24.95k £39.63k £54.20k £82.33k £21.74k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.00k £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A