MYLNHURST SPORTS EDUCATION & LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The education, training, fitness and health of Mylnhurst School pupils. 2. Providing facilities for the education, training, fitness and health of the wider community. 3. Providing opportunities for employment and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loretta Giaimo-Cossar | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Francesca Burley | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Phillipa Hopkins | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Daniel Smith | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Anita Barker | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Orlaith Firth | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Alexander Rawlings | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.39k | £157.53k | £142.20k | £723.61k | £239.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.49k | £135.18k | £163.17k | £201.46k | £266.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £723.61k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £201.46k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED 18 APRIL 2008 AND 28 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF MYLNHURST CATHOLIC PREPARATORY SCHOOL AND NURSERY SHEFFIELD (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER: 1056683) ("THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE THEM TO PLAY SPORTS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) SWIMMING, WATER POLO, FOOTBALL, NETBALL, BASKETBALL, BADMINTON, GYMNASTICS AND DANCE, AND IN SO FAR AS SUCH FACILITIES ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL THEY SHALL BE MADE AVAILABLE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF THE YOUNG, AGED, INFIRM AND DISABLED IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mylnhurst RC School & Nursery
Button Hill
Sheffield
S11 9HJ
- Phone:
- 01142353835
- Email:
- enquiries@mylnhurst.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window