THE MELISSA NATHAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Melissa Nathan Foundation provides support for families in crisis. The families might be struggling to cope with illness, incapacity, poverty or other domestic crises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JEREMY NATHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £895 | £1.03k | £5.30k | £32.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.80k | £0 | £8.68k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3 THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Halsbury Close
Stanmore
HA7 3DY
- Phone:
- 07595333952
- Email:
- brian@bandbnathan.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window