Financial history THE ELDER TREE LIMITED (VOLUNTARY VISITING SERVICE)

Charity number: 1124248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £667.94k £703.82k £812.75k £728.36k £819.78k
Total expenditure £639.15k £628.47k £719.34k £803.97k £820.52k
Income from government contracts £443.77k £492.80k £563.42k £506.42k £590.47k
Income from government grants £8.47k £39.40k £12.29k £2.50k £3.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.47k £4.36k £2.10k £3.75k £6.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £652.79k £698.88k £810.32k £724.08k £810.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £681 £577 £329 £525 £2.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £603.74k £588.35k £671.90k £762.92k £782.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.41k £40.12k £47.44k £41.05k £37.98k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0