FAITH ENCOUNTER PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works to foster mutual understanding between people of different faiths in Birmingham and the West Midlands mainly by running Faith Guiding courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Leicester City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Carol Bailey | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Esther Sarah Simone Whitehouse | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yvonne June Stollard | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
OSMAN SHEIKH | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mauricio Silva | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.34k | £0 | £1.01k | £8.63k | £5.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.49k | £545 | £4.21k | £4.33k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND SOCIAL COHESION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY OFFERING EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS FROM THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION (AND FURTHER AFIELD) IN ORDER TO DEVELOP MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT BETWEEN PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Annes Presbytery Fatima House-
96 Bradford Street
BIRMINGHAM
B12 0PB
- Phone:
- 447834320663
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window