Accounts and annual returns PATA (UK)

Charity number: 1124222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window