Financial history PATA (UK)

Charity number: 1124222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £817.78k £782.43k £1.07m £865.25k £965.60k
Total expenditure £751.01k £818.80k £992.21k £963.90k £986.23k
Income from government contracts £509.81k £528.28k £647.36k £541.15k £672.55k
Income from government grants £17.51k £21.70k £26.89k £10.59k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.65k £56 £16 £269 £127
Income - Other trading activities £17.22k £18.57k £24.52k £29.63k £38.44k
Income - Charitable activities £774.90k £762.02k £1.04m £832.38k £921.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £433 £203 £163 £2.94k £4.83k
Income - Other £1.57k £1.58k £3.46k £27 £297
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £666.30k £812.68k £985.90k £958.76k £978.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.08k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.99k £9.05k £9.35k £10.06k £13.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £5.27k £1.25k £1.00k £850
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81.63k £6.11k £6.31k £5.14k £7.85k