PATA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ENHANCE DEVELOPMENT,CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER SCHOOL AGE AND CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.ENCOURAGE FORMATION OF GROUPS OFFERING PLAY,EDUCATION AND CARE;OFFER SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO GROUPS; ENCOURAGE STUDY OF NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES.PROVIDE TRAINING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£965,599
Donations and legacies | £127 | |
Charitable activities | £921.90k | |
Other trading activities | £38.44k | |
Investments | £4.83k | |
Other | £297 |
Total expenditure:
£986,233
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £978.39k | |
Other | £7.85k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £672,545 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.85k | |
Charitable expenditure | £978.39k |
People

58 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
- Oxfordshire
- South Gloucestershire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 May 2008: Standard registration
- 07 October 2016: Funds received from 1056718 TINY TOTS PLAYGROUP (LONGLEVENS)
- 07 October 2016: Funds received from 1138211 ELMBRIDGE UNDER FIVES
- 07 October 2016: Funds received from 1105898 PENGUINS PRE-SCHOOL CENTRE
- 25 January 2019: Funds received from 1063778 KEMBLE AND DISTRICT PLAYGROUP
- 15 February 2020: Funds received from 1064295 FUNBUSTERS @ EVERLANDS
- 28 September 2022: Funds received from 1055607 ST AUGUSTINES PLAYGROUP
- 08 November 2022: Funds received from 1055509 SUNSHINE CORNER UNDER 5'S
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1052087 WINCHCOMBE PLAYGROUP
- PATA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Cranfield | Chair | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Honesty Jane Walker | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Allen | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEREK STANLEY JONES | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr AMY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karen Susan Heaton-Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £817.78k | £782.43k | £1.07m | £865.25k | £965.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £751.01k | £818.80k | £992.21k | £963.90k | £986.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £509.81k | £528.28k | £647.36k | £541.15k | £672.55k | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.51k | £21.70k | £26.89k | £10.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £23.65k | £56 | £16 | £269 | £127 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £17.22k | £18.57k | £24.52k | £29.63k | £38.44k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £774.90k | £762.02k | £1.04m | £832.38k | £921.90k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £433 | £203 | £163 | £2.94k | £4.83k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.57k | £1.58k | £3.46k | £27 | £297 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £666.30k | £812.68k | £985.90k | £958.76k | £978.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.99k | £9.05k | £9.35k | £10.06k | £13.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £5.27k | £1.25k | £1.00k | £850 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £81.63k | £6.11k | £6.31k | £5.14k | £7.85k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £41.88k | £56.08k | £51.34k | £50.14k | £34.29k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £391.77k | £381.41k | £459.44k | £345.18k | £352.26k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.20k | £57.30k | £55.96k | £39.16k | £51.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 2008 as amended on 19 Mar 2019 as amended on 28 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS; AND 3.2 TO ENCOURAGE THE FORMATION OF GROUPS OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, TOGETHER WITH THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THESE GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY AND OFFERING CONTINUING SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT AND HELP TO THESE GROUPS; AND 3.3 TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE RECOGNITION OF THESE NEEDS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
P A T A
Chequers Bridge Centre
Painswick Road
GLOUCESTER
GL4 6PR
- Phone:
- 01452541244
- Email:
- info@pataglos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window