Accounts and annual returns THORNBURY MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1124233
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 February 2025 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 February 2025 378 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window