Financial history THORNBURY MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1124233
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.53k £907 £2.10k £49.26k £47.05k
Total expenditure £46.92k £5.72k £6.27k £53.04k £52.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A