Accounts and annual returns THE HOLISTIC PATHWAYS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1124336
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 26 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required