Financial history NEOTROPICAL PRIMATE CONSERVATION

Charity Number: 1131122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.80k £10.48k £14.28k £22.98k £23.29k
Total expenditure £9.48k £10.96k £12.62k £24.40k £24.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A