Trustees NEOTROPICAL PRIMATE CONSERVATION

Charity Number: 1131122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BROOKE CATHERINE ALDRICH Chair
None on record
Kristina Stazaker Trustee 09 June 2024
None on record
Lauren Arnaud James Trustee 09 June 2024
None on record
Dr Magdalena Svensson Trustee 09 June 2024
None on record
Joy Roberts-Chapple Trustee 30 March 2021
None on record
Rachel Louise Henson Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Katie Chabriere Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Mika Peck Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record