WHITEKNIGHTS YORKSHIRE BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and protect health by the provision of transport of urgently needed blood, drugs, human tissues and other medical requirements between hospitals and blood transfusion banks primarily but not exclusively in Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 June 2008: Standard registration
- WYBB (abbreviation for Whiteknights Yorkshire Blood Bikes) (Working name)
- WHITEKNIGHTS EMERGENCY VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Foster | Chair | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Butterfield | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harrison | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wragg | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Clark | Trustee | 03 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Beynon-Tullet | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Tice | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.31k | £34.64k | £48.06k | £57.14k | £52.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.49k | £43.06k | £49.59k | £55.30k | £52.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2016 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY IS; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN TISSUES AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Topland Communications Ltd
Hamnett House
Gibbet Street
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX2 0AX
- Phone:
- 07970224420
- Email:
- info@whiteknights.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window