BRUNSWICK HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brunswick Healthy Living Centre is a multi-service centre. Through Partnership working the centre acts as a joined up centre offering services to the community addresssing holistic health and wellbeing. Work is achieved through activities : the community cafe, physical activities, room hire, computer facilities, supported Volunteer programme, health promotion and a business enterprise service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £95,915 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 13 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Elisabeth Kenna Saunders | Chair | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Etty Martin | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ellen Bowmer | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN Mawdsley | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Lavelle | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stanislaw Jan Sakowicz-Librowski | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.99k | £276.00k | £263.02k | £351.92k | £321.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £332.70k | £226.00k | £250.32k | £335.88k | £348.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £70.00k | N/A | £142.33k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £76.10k | N/A | £99.37k | £142.33k | £95.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE LEAMINGTON OLD TOWN OF WARWICKSHIRE WITHIN THE MUNICIPAL DISTRICT OF WARWICK (THE AREA)) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A THE RELIEF OF POVERTY B THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR II TO EXISTING BUSINESSES D THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISIONS OF PUBLIC AMENITIES E THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES F THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE IN THE AREA G SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF ENGLAND AND WALESS
Area of benefit
THE LEAMINGTON OLD TOWN OF WARWICKSHIRE WITHIN THE MUNICIPAL DISTRICT OF WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRUNSWICK HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE LTD
98-100 SHRUBLAND STREET
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 3BD
- Phone:
- 01926422123
- Email:
- frontdesk@bhlc.services
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window