SOMALI YOUTH HELPLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Somali Youth Helpline provides: confidential telephone and email counselling; drop-in session, sign posting and referrals, training and parent/child sessions as well as training and tuition and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 06 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUDA DUALEH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAGAL KAHIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMIRA HAJI FARAH ELMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.03k | £14.52k | £16.24k | £16.14k | £20.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.41k | £14.21k | £16.15k | £16.08k | £19.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG SOMALI PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING TOWNS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AS A MEANS OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING SOMALI YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILL, CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B ADVANCING EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT C PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, EALING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RESOURCE CENTRE
FEATHERSTONE TERRACE
SOUTHALL
UB2 5AL
- Phone:
- 02030922946
- Email:
- syhelpline@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window