Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN DEAL CENTRE FOR THE RETIRED LIMITED

Charity number: 1124073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 March 2025 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window