Financial history ST PAUL'S PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1124490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £162.49k £145.16k £122.12k £131.81k £143.15k
Total expenditure £156.22k £139.79k £148.37k £131.57k £138.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.93k N/A N/A N/A