ST PAUL'S PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Pauls Preschool provides quality care and education for children from the age of two years to rising fives. We are an inclusive setting and offer a curriculum that follows the requirements and guidance set out in the Early Years foundation Stage (DFES).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 12 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Abbott | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lorraine Bruford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA STROUD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE PASCOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.49k | £145.16k | £122.12k | £131.81k | £143.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.22k | £139.79k | £148.37k | £131.57k | £138.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) ARE; TO OFFER CARE AND EDUCATION FOR 2-5 YEAR OLD CHILDREN BY PROVIDING A SAFE, STIMULATING AND CARING ENVIRONMENT THAT PROMOTES LEARNING THROUGH PLAY; TO SUPPORT AND NURTURE THE CHILDREN BOTH DEVELOPMENTALLY AND PERSONALLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS PRESCHOOL
BARNE LANE
ST BUDEAUX
PLYMOUTH
PL5 1NE
- Phone:
- 01752517473
- Email:
- stpaulspreschool@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window