LINTHORPE ROAD RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open access to our premises, facilities and activities, office services for all sections of community ,particularly Voluntary Organisations, Local Residents and others, including statutory agencies who provide activities for local residents. Provision of a place of welcome and an opportunity for space, peace, reflection, listening and discussion for people of all ages, beliefs and backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 24 October 2008: Standard registration
- LINTHORPE ROAD COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Andrew Godfrey | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr STEPHEN SUTCLIFFE | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Charity Kathleen McKenzie Hamilton | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Robert Munby | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Lesley Duffield | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.07k | £8.86k | £51.60k | £37.78k | £38.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.47k | £26.61k | £32.33k | £22.02k | £39.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 February 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 February 2021 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ACQUIRE, OWN, TAKE ON LEASE, OCCUPY, ANY LAND OR BUILDINGS FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE OR ANY PURPOSES INCIDENTAL THERETO; TO CREATE, PROMOTE, DEVELOP, MAINTAIN AND OPERATE A COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE, CAFE", RESTAURANT, TUITION FACILITIES, EDUCATION FACILITIES, RESOURCE CENTRE, LIBRARY, DISPLAY AREAS, GALLERIES, COMMUNICATIONS FACILITIES; TO PROVIDE OPEN ACCESS TO THE COMPANY'S PREMISES, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR ALL SECTIONS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND THOSE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND LEARNING DISABILITIES; TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WELCOME AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR SPACE, PEACE, REFLECTION, LISTENING AND DISCUSSION TO BE AVAILABLE FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, BELIEFS AND BACKGROUNDS; TO SUPPLY AND MAKE AVAILABLE ADDITIONAL MATERIALS, BOOKS, MAGAZINES AND LITERATURE OF ALL KINDS, WHETHER IN PRINTED, ELECTRONIC OR OTHER FORMS, AUDIO AND VISUAL RECORDINGS, SOFTWARE AND OTHER ITEMS AND MATERIALS; TO REFURBISH, REPAIR, DECORATE, FURNISH, EQUIP, DEVELOP, MODIFY, EXTEND, MAINTAIN AND PROTECT THE PROPERTY OF THE COMPANY. 3.1.2 TO CARRY ON ANY OTHER TRADE OR BUSINESS WHATEVER WHICH CAN IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS BE ADVANTAGEOUSLY CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH OR ANCILLARY TO ANY OF THE BUSINESSES OF THE COMPANY. 3.2 TO PURCHASE OR BY ANY OTHER MEANS ACQUIRE AND TAKE OPTIONS OVER ANY PROPERTY WHATEVER, AND ANY RIGHTS OR PRIVILEGES OF ANY KIND OVER OR IN RESPECT OF ANY PROPERTY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE. LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Methodist Church
54 Borough Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS1 2JH
- Phone:
- 01642278140
- Email:
- linthorperesource@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window