The Big Fish Band ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Big Fish Band (AKA Big Fish Arts Trust)is a volunteer run community group creating Arts and Heritage Events including Street theatre, Historic Research, Street band, drama & costume workshops, dramatised walks and plays based on local Historic events, Community opera, plays and films. We run Heritage Festivals, Lantern Parades and take part in Carnivals and festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 02 June 2008: Standard registration
- Big Fish Arts (Working name)
- SHEPPEY BIG FISH THEATRE TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- The Big Fish Band (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Marina Baxter | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD JOHN TESTER | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE PERCIVAL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.13k | £3.84k | £10.78k | £14.23k | £7.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.89k | £3.16k | £8.02k | £10.84k | £9.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 25 Mar 2022 as amended on 01 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 MARINE PARADE
SHEERNESS
ME12 2BD
- Phone:
- 07775712306
- Email:
- chrisonsheppey@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window