Accounts and annual returns SPEIRS HOUSE

Charity Number: 1124294
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 28 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2009 17 June 2010 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 14 June 2010 45 days late