Accounts and annual returns ASPIRATIONAL NORTHERN GROUP ENHANCING LIVES (A.N.G.E.L)
Charity number: 1124593

Charity reporting is overdue by 1471 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 22 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days | |
Annual return | 22 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 741 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 741 days | |
Annual return | 22 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1106 days | |
Annual return | 22 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1471 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window