Financial history EMU MUSIC LTD

Charity number: 1124923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.49k £42.49k £55.26k £44.14k £37.19k
Total expenditure £39.71k £39.71k £67.70k £23.43k £5.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.85k N/A £14.02k N/A N/A