Financial history THE CHILDREN'S LITERACY CHARITY

Charity number: 1124257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £485.82k £432.39k £480.61k £628.15k £673.99k
Total expenditure £439.25k £371.79k £468.41k £537.90k £608.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £198.95k £252.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £428.93k £420.66k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £269 £580
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £11.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £437.05k £507.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £100.85k £100.33k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £35.91k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0