SANT BABA BHAG SINGH MEMORIAL CHARITABLE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING/FACILITATING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENGINEERING,TECHNOLOGY, NURSING & SPORTS THROUGH THE FUNDING OF LECTURES, RESEARCH, PUBLISHING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, HANDS ON TRAINING, PROVIDING EXTRA FACILITIES AT SCHOOLS, COLLEGES ETC PROVIDING SERVICES OF WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS TEACHING; FACILITIES/SERVICES TO ALLOW BELIEVERS TO PRACTICE THEIR FAITH OR FOLLOW ITS DOCTRINES; DISTRIBUTION OF SACRED TEXTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- India
Governance
- 21 October 2008: Standard registration
- SBBSMC SOCIETY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAVINDER SINGH KHERA MLIA DIP | Chair | 21 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
GURVINDER SINGH DHILLON | Trustee | 21 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
JUJHAR SINGH DHILLON | Trustee | 21 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
RAJINDER SINGH DHILLON | Trustee | 21 October 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/05/2020 | 04/05/2021 | 04/05/2022 | 04/05/2023 | 04/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.97k | £58.61k | £38.41k | £26.13k | £16.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.98k | £42.32k | £23.57k | £15.93k | £35.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 May 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 May 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 May 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 5 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SIKH RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, NURSING AND SPORTS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION AND WAY OF LIFE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 745
SOUTHALL
UB3 9RQ
- Phone:
- 08452669374
- Email:
- sbbsuni@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window